Global Patent Index - EP 1016744 A1

EP 1016744 A1 2000-07-05 - System and method for adjusting the thread clamp of a feeding gripper and loom with such system

Title (en)

System and method for adjusting the thread clamp of a feeding gripper and loom with such system

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Einstellen der Fadenklemme eines Bringergreifers und webmaschine mit einem System

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour régler le pince-fil d'une pince d'amenée et métier à tisser avec un tel système

Publication

EP 1016744 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811061 A

Priority

  • EP 99811061 A
  • EP 98811235 A

Abstract (en)

To set the yarn clamp at weft insertion gripper (16), of a gripper loom, the position of the weft (10) at the yarn clamp (1) is scanned within a weaving cycle, to alter the setting of the yarn clamp. A monitor (19) checks the position of the weft yarn (10) in the clamping zone, pref. at the clamping gap of the yarn clamp (1). The monitor (19) has at least one signal transmitter (21). The signal transmitter is a light chamber with at least one light source and a light receiver, or it is a number of diodes. The monitor (19) is at a gap from the movement path of the gripper, at the entry side into the shed at the loom.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Verfahren wird ein über einen Fadenspannungssensor (12) zugeführter und durch einen Fadenvorleger (13) vorgelegter Schussfaden (10) mittels des Greifers (16) mit Fadenklemme in ein Webfach eingetragen. Die Weite des Klemmspaltes und/oder die Klemmkraft der Fadenklemme sind verstellbar, um unterschiedliche Garnarten einzutragen. Die Lage des vom Greifer übernommenen Schussfadens (10) in der Fadenklemme (1) wird innerhalb eines Webzyklus abgetastet, um die Einstellung der Fadenklemme in Abhängigkeit der gemessenen Fadenzugkraft und/oder der vorgelegten Gamart zu verändern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; D03D 47/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/23 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); D03D 47/23 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016744 A1 20000705; EP 1016744 B1 20030709

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906254

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULTEX A.G.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906254 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI