Global Patent Index - EP 1016749 A2

EP 1016749 A2 2000-07-05 - Machine for the treatment of several ropes of textile fabric

Title (en)

Machine for the treatment of several ropes of textile fabric

Title (de)

Maschine zur Behandlung von mehreren strangförmigen Textilbahnen

Title (fr)

Machine pour le traitement de plusieurs étoffes textiles sous forme de boyau

Publication

EP 1016749 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125236 A

Priority

IT MI982739 A

Abstract (en)

A machine (1) for the simultaneous treatment of several ropes (2) of fabric, in particular for the fulling and/or washing of fabrics, including a treatment chamber (4) and drive means (5) for maintaining each rope (2) of fabric in motion along a respective loop path within the treatment chamber (4): the drive means (5) including, for each rope (2) of fabric, a pair of drive cylinders 6 for the rope itself, a plurality of the said pairs of drive cylinders (6) being driven by a single motor (3); the machine (1) further includes displacement means (10) operable independently on each pair of drive cylinders (6) to bring the drive cylinders (6) of each pair selectively to assume a first operating position in which the drive cylinders (6) are close to one another to be able to drive the respective rope (2) of fabric, and a second operating position in which the drive cylinders (6) are spaced from one another and no longer able to drive the rope (2) of fabric. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 3/26; D06C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/26 (2006.01); D06C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 17/00 (2013.01); D06B 3/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016749 A2 20000705; EP 1016749 A3 20001122; EP 1016749 B1 20030502; DE 69907386 D1 20030605; DE 69907386 T2 20040401; ES 2195499 T3 20031201; IT 1304187 B1 20010308; IT MI982739 A1 20000619; PT 1016749 E 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-06-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907386

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIMI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT PT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI