Global Patent Index - EP 1016750 A3

EP 1016750 A3 2000-12-20 - Device for raising the pile of a fabric

Title (en)

Device for raising the pile of a fabric

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Floraufrichten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de redressement du poil d' un tissu

Publication

EP 1016750 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123558 A

Priority

DE 29823239 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016750A2] Assembly (100) to align the fabric piles (6) to stand upright. The fabric travels over the support with the pile moved against the direction of the flattened piles. A unit over the fabric delivers a blade-shaped air stream (18) against the fabric surface, in the direction of travel (4) and at an angle (13) of 45 degrees against the piles across the machine width. The fabric support is a fixed plate (8) across the machine width, where the pile fabric (10) slides over it. The support plate (8) is directly after a rotating support roller (1), with the upper side (8') of the plate at a tangent to the roller (1). The air stream (18) is delivered by a jet (20), with a flat and smooth outlet channel (12), over the fabric support. The jet outlet channel (12) is between a flat profile (9) and the end of the under side (11') of the leg of an upper angle profile (11) closely over it and parallel in the direction (4) of travel and at the same position (11). A hollow profile (14), across the fabric (10) width, has a compressed air connection (15), It has an outer rectangular side (14'), towards the fabric (10), with a projecting flat profile (9) in the direction (4) of fabric (10) travel. The leading rectangular side (14) supports an angle profile (11). The blower outlet channel (12) is formed between the upper side (9') of the flat profile and the under side (11') of the angle profile leg, at the passage opening array (16) into the hollow profile (14) for the cross section of the blower channel (12). The hollow profile (14) and/or the flat profile (9) and/or the angle profile (11) are linked to swing holder plates (23) outside the side edges of the fabric (10), which swing round a lateral axis (21), so that the outlet jet (20) and the hollow profile (14) can swing upwards away from the fabric support roller (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29823239 U1 20000511; EP 1016750 A2 20000705; EP 1016750 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021029

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI