Global patent index - EP 1016753 A2

EP 1016753 A2 2000-07-05 - Guiding assembly for screen clothes

Title (en)

Guiding assembly for screen clothes

Title (de)

Siebbandanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage pour toiles de tamissages

Publication

EP 1016753 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890237 A

Priority

AT 213698 A

Abstract (en)

The fourdrinier assembly has a number of support and guide rollers to carry the fourdrinier (10). A monitor system (1) registers the lateral position of at least one roller (20), mounted on a sliding bearing pedestal, with a coupling for adjustment between the setting mechanism for the bearing pedestal on a slide and the monitor (1). The coupling is a Bowden (RTM; sliding cable within a sheath) cable (12), or hydraulic cylinders, or an electrical circuit for the operation to move the roller (20) to adjust its position. DETAILED A twin-arm lever is at the carrier for the slide of the sliding roller (20), with one arm coupled to the slide and the other arm linked to a return unit. The first arm of the lever has a slit, to take a setting member of the bearing pedestal for the sliding roller (20). The position of the setting member is offset from the setting lever, to alter the setting value through the sliding movement of the bearing pedestal. The second arm of the setting lever is connected to the cable coupling (12). The piston rod of a hydraulic cylinder can be connected to the second arm of the setting lever, with hydraulic link channels to a further hydraulic cylinder where its piston rod is connected to the monitor (1). The second arm of the setting lever can be the setting unit of an electrical circuit, with an electromotor, operated by the monitor (1).

Abstract (de)

Siebbandanlage mit einer Vielzahl von Trag- und Führungswalzen (20), über welche ein Siebband (10) geführt ist, mit einer Einrichtung (1) zum Abtasten der Querlage des Siebbandes (10) und einer Einrichtung (2) zur Verstellung der Winkellage mindestens einer der Trag- und Führungswalzen (20), welche einseitig auf einem verschiebbaren Lagerbock (21) gelagert ist, wobei zwischen der Stelleinrichtung (2) für den an einem Schlitten angeordneten Lagerbock (21) der verschiebbaren Walze (20) und der Abtasteinrichtung (1) eine Kupplung (3) vorgesehen ist, durch welche eine Rückführung der Stellbewegung der Walze (20) zur Abtasteinrichtung (1) bewirkt wird. Dabei ist die Kupplung durch einen Bowdenzug, durch eine hydraulische Schaltung mit Stellzylindern oder durch eine elektrische Schaltung mit Stelleinrichtungen gebildet (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/36 (2006.01); D21F 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/40 (2013.01); D21F 1/365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016753 A2 20000705; EP 1016753 A3 20010816; AT 406643 B 20000725; AT A213698 A 19991215; CA 2287178 A1 20000622; CA 2287178 C 20060124; JP 2000273784 A 20001003; US 6312562 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040101

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI