Global Patent Index - EP 1016754 A1

EP 1016754 A1 2000-07-05 - Machine and method for the manufacture of a fibrous web

Title (en)

Machine and method for the manufacture of a fibrous web

Title (de)

Maschine sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Machine et procédé pour la fabrication d'une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 1016754 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125789 A

Priority

DE 19860687 A

Abstract (en)

The papermaking machine, especially for tissue or toilet paper, has at least one press gap (12) between a shoe press unit (14) and the drying/tissue cylinder (16). The length (L) of the press gap is 60 mm, in the direction (l) of web travel. The pressure profile along the length (L) of the press gap (12) has a max. pressure of 3.3 MPa. The press gap length (L) is pref. 50 mm, and the max. pressure is 4.8 MPa within a press gap length stretch of 37 mm. To form a tissue paper web, the angle between the tangent at the end of the press gap (12) at the drying cylinder (16) and the carrier blanket (18) leaving the press gap (12) is 10 degrees and especially 18 degrees and pref. 20 degrees . The press blanket (20) is ridged and/or is fitted with blind drillings. The length (L) of the press gap (12) can be 80 mm and pref. less than 200 mm and especially a max. of 150 mm. The max. pressure in the pressure profile is 2 MPa. The max. linear pressure applied in the press gap (12) is 90-110 kN/m and/or the shoe press unit (14) has a press shoe (22) with a number of independent press components (26) across the direction (l) of web travel, to be pressed against the drying cylinder. The drying cylinder (16) is a Yankee cylinder and/or has an asymmetrical pressure profile along the length (L) of the press gap. The max. pressure is applied in the trailing one-half or one-quarter of the press gap length (L), in the direction (l) of web travel. The mean pressure rise gradient from the start of the press gap to the max. pressure zone, with a carrier blanket of a new value, is 40 kPa/mm and especially 60 kPa/mm and pref. 120 kPa/mm and/or the mean pressure drop gradient at the end of the press gap with a new value carrier blanket is 300 kPa/mm and especially 500 kPa/mm and pref. 800 kPa/mm or 800 kPa/mm or 960 kPa/mm and/or the water-absorbent blanket (18) in the press gap (12) lies between the impermeable press blanket (20) and the web with the web in contact with the drying cylinder (16) and/or a felt blanket is used for the water-absorbent carrier (18). The water-absorbent carrier blanket (18) has different qualities through its thickness, with a finer structure at the side towards the web than at the other side. The press blanket (20) has a surface which is smooth, ridged and/or with blind drillings and/or at least one additional press gap (12) is formed at the drying cylinder (16) using two shoe press units (14). A further press gap (12) is formed before the drying cylinder (16), in the direction (l) of web travel and/or the carrier blanket (18) and the web pass through at least one preceding suction unit. The suction unit has a suction roller and/or a suction shoe and/or it is a shoe press roller where the press blanket is pref. formed by the press mantle (20) of the shoe press roller (14). The shoe press unit (14) has at least one replaceable press shoe (22) and/or the carrier blanket is structured to give an imprint or patterning. An Independent claim is included for tissue-toilet paper prodn., where the wet fiber web is within the press gap (12) for a time span of max. 3 ms at a pressure of at least 3.3 MPa or at least 3.5 ms at a max. pressure of 2 MPa.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere Tissue- oder Hygienepapierbahn, umfaßt wenigstens einen zwischen einer Schuhpreßeinheit 14 und einem Trockenzylinder 16 gebildeten Preßspalt 12, durch den ein wasseraufnehmendes Trägerband 18, ein wasserundurchlässiges Preßband 20 und die Faserstoffbahn hindurchgeführt sind. Dabei ist wenigstens ein zwischen einer Schuhpreßeinheit 14 und dem Trockenzylinder 16 gebildeter Preßspalt 12 vorgesehen, dessen in Bahnlaufrichtung l betrachtete Länge L kleiner oder gleich einem Wert von etwa 60 mm ist und dessen sich über die Preßspaltlänge L ergebendes Druckprofil einen maximalen Preßdruck aufweist, der größer oder gleich einem Wert von etwa 3,3 MPa ist. Alternativ kann die Preßspaltlänge größer als ein Wert von etwa 80 mm sein, wobei in diesem Fall der maximale Preßdruck kleiner oder gleich einem Wert von etwa 2 MPa ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/0281 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29719501 U1 19971218 - LRE TECHNOLOGY PARTNER GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016754 A1 20000705; EP 1016754 B1 20080625; AT 399224 T 20080715; AT 538243 T 20120115; BR 9906261 A 20000822; BR 9906261 B1 20091201; CA 2293215 A1 20000629; CA 2293215 C 20110830; CA 2718031 A1 20000629; CA 2718031 C 20121009; CA 2718114 A1 20000629; CA 2718114 C 20130212; CA 2718288 A1 20000629; DE 19860687 A1 20000706; DE 59914794 D1 20080807; EP 1816256 A1 20070808; EP 1816256 B1 20111221; US 2002069995 A1 20020613; US 2004134632 A1 20040715; US 2004194904 A1 20041007; US 2004261967 A1 20041230; US 6746574 B2 20040608; US 7288168 B2 20071030; US 7326320 B2 20080205; US 7332059 B2 20080219

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914794 P 20080807

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2001-07-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI