Global Patent Index - EP 1016759 A1

EP 1016759 A1 2000-07-05 - Method and device to improve foundation soil with determination of the grade of compaction

Title (en)

Method and device to improve foundation soil with determination of the grade of compaction

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung eines Baugrundes unter Ermittlung des Verdichtungsgrades

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif d'amélioration du sol de fondation avec détermination du degré de compaction

Publication

EP 1016759 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124258 A

Priority

DE 19859962 A

Abstract (en)

The angle between the deflection of the device in the rotation path plane, and the imbalancing weight (11) inside the device is determined and used to calculate degree of compaction, which in turn is used to control the compaction performance of the device. The deep vibration device (1) is lowered vertically into the soil, and an imbalancing weight is made to rotate about the length axis (2) of the device, so that the device follows a rotation path in a horizontal plane. An Independent claim is also included for the deep vibration device used.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung eines Baugrundes unter Ermittlung des Verdichtungsgrades, bei dem ein Tiefenrüttler 1 vertikal in den Baugrund niedergebracht wird, der mittels einer im Tiefenrüttler 1 um eine Längsachse 2 drehend angetriebenen Unwuchtmasse 11 bezogen auf eine horizontale Ebene auf eine Rüttlerkreisbahn beschleunigt wird. Um während des Rüttelvorgangs Aussagen über den Verdichtungsgrad des Baugrundes machen zu können, ist vorgesehen, daß ein Vorlaufwinkel zwischen der Winkelposition der Auslenkung des Tiefenrüttlers 1 auf der Rüttlerkreisbahn und der Winkelposition der Unwuchtmasse 11 in einer horizontalen Ebene ermittelt wird, welcher als Kenngröße zur Bestimmung des Verdichtungsgrades dient, wobei in Abhängigkeit vom Vorlaufwinkel, die vom Tiefenrüttler 1 in den Baugrund eingebrachte Verdichtungsleistung gesteuert wird. Der Tiefenrüttler 1 weist hierzu eine in einem Gehäuse des Tiefenrüttlers rotierend antreibbare Unwuchtmasse 11 auf, sowie zumindest ein Paar von Beschleunigungsaufnehmern 14, welche in einer Meßebene mit rechtwinklig zueinander liegenden Meßachsen angeordnet sind, mit denen die Auslenkung des Tiefenrüttlers 1 auf der Rüttlerkreisbahn ermittelt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/054; E02D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 1/02 (2006.01); E02D 3/054 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 1/02 (2013.01); E02D 3/054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4130339 A1 19930325 - KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016759 A1 20000705; DE 19859962 A1 20000713; DE 19859962 C2 20010712

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020810

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FELLIN WOLFGANG, DR.-ING.

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI