Global patent index - EP 1016762 A3

EP 1016762 A3 2000-10-25 - Earth moving machine

Title (en)

Earth moving machine

Title (de)

Erdbewegungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de terrassement

Publication

EP 1016762 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125135 A

Priority

GB 9827558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2344809A] An earth moving apparatus 10 comprises a rotatably carried body 15 including an operator's cab 18 positioned at a first side and an engine 39 in a compartment 38, orientated longitudinally, at a second opposite side, a working arm 21 at a first end carrying an implement 30 and a counterweight 44 at a second end. The engine compartment may be covered with one or more shaped body panels (S1,S2 Fig.3) which curve downward from a maximum height at the seated operator's position to or adjacent to a front corner extremity of the body. The counterweight may be an integral part of the body to comprise part of a wall structure 41. The operating functions can be powered by hydraulic fluid provided by a single variable displacement hydraulic pump 43 via control means, said pump preferably positioned between the engine and a first end of the apparatus. Pressurised hydraulic fluid may supply actuator means to operate a working arm and/or an implement relative to said arm and/or transmission to operate ground propulsion means and/or means to rotate the body relative to a base about an upright axis. An up/down actuated earth moving plough 35 powered by hydraulic pressure may be provided. The working arm may comprise a boom 22 and dipper 24 and ground propulsion can be by a pair of tracks 36, whereby the edges of said tracks define the width of the base and also of the apparatus. By mounting a cab and engine "side by side" the specified apparatus aims to provide space for a longer, larger cab than with a rear mounted engine and sloped body panels to give improved visual range over the frontal area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/12; E02F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/38 (2006.01); E02F 3/96 (2006.01); E02F 9/08 (2006.01); E02F 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/0891 (2013.01); E02F 3/325 (2013.01); E02F 3/384 (2013.01); E02F 3/964 (2013.01); E02F 9/0866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2344809 A 20000621; GB 2344809 B 20021002; GB 9827558 D0 19990210; EP 1016762 A2 20000705; EP 1016762 A3 20001025

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20041203

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020822

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 02F 9/12 A, 7E 02F 9/22 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI