Global Patent Index - EP 1016765 A2

EP 1016765 A2 2000-07-05 - Static and dynamic load dissipating and limiting device for civil and industrial works

Title (en)

Static and dynamic load dissipating and limiting device for civil and industrial works

Title (de)

Statische und dynamische Belastungskräfte-Verteilung und -Begrenzungsvorrichtung für Zivil- und Industrie-Konstruktionen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dissipation et de limitation de charges statiques et dynamiques pour constructions d'habitation et industrielles

Publication

EP 1016765 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125754 A

Priority

IT MI982839 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a load dissipating and limiting device for protecting, recovering and making civil and industrial works, having a high strength against undesired static, seismic, aeolian and dynamic effects, comprising a plurality of shape memory alloy wires operating under a super-elastic effect and having their end portions interconnected to connecting element for coupling to a construction to be protected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/98; E04H 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016765 A2 20000705; EP 1016765 A3 20010606; IT 1309546 B1 20020123; IT MI982839 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: STATIC AND DYNAMIC LOAD DISSIPATING AND LIMITING DEVICE FOR CIVIL AND INDUSTRIAL WORKS

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI