Global Patent Index - EP 1016773 A2

EP 1016773 A2 2000-07-05 - Coolable turbine blade

Title (en)

Coolable turbine blade

Title (de)

Kühlbare Schaufel für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Aube de turbine refroidissable

Publication

EP 1016773 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811183 A

Priority

DE 19860788 A

Abstract (en)

A blade (10) constitutes a gas turbine coolable vane and is formed by suction-side and pressure-side walls. The walls form a hollow space (20) and are joined at their front (16) and rear (18) edges. The vane has foot (30) and root (40), which acts as transition area between the blade and the foot. The foot is provided with at least one cooling channel (20) integrated in the hollow space and through which a coolant (K) flows.

Abstract (de)

Kühlbare Schaufel für eine Gasturbine oder dergleichen, mit einem Schaufelblatt (10), das aus einer saugseitigen Wand (12) und einer druckseitigen Wand (14) aufgebaut ist, welche unter Bildung eines Hohlraumes (20) über eine Vorderkante (16) und eine Hinterkante (18) verbunden sind, einem Schaufelfuß (30), einer Schaufelwurzel (40) als Übergangsbereich zwischen dem Schaufelblatt (10) und dem Schaufelfuß (30), wenigstens einem Kühlkanal (20), der im Hohlraum (20) integriert und von einem Kühlmedium (K) durchströmbar ist, sowie Ausblasöffnungen für das Kühlmedium (K), die ausgehend von einer Eintrittsebene (56) am Hohlraum durchgehend zu einer Austrittsebene (58) im Bereich der Hinterkante (18) angeordnet sind, wobei dass zumindest im Bereich der Hinterkante (18) die Schaufelwurzel (40) einen konkav gekrümmten Konturverlauf aufweist und eine der Ausblasöffnungen als Ausblasschlitz (50) an der Schaufelwurzel (40) angeordnet ist, der sich in der Austrittsebene (58) der Hinterkante (18) in radialer Richtung (r) zumindest über den gesamten Bereich der Schaufelwurzel (40) erstreckt und dessen Querschnittsform zumindest in der Austrittsebene (58) dem Konturverlauf der Schaufelwurzel (40) soweit folgt, dass Wandabschnitte (42) mit angenähert konstanter Wanddicke (d) entstehen. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5498133 A 19960312 - LEE CHING-PANG [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016773 A2 20000705; EP 1016773 A3 20031203; EP 1016773 B1 20050803; DE 19860788 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA IP UK LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59912356

2017-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912356

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59912356

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA IP UK LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59912356

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912356

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051003

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912356 P 20050908

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI