Global Patent Index - EP 1016783 A2

EP 1016783 A2 2000-07-05 - Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour moteurs à combustion

Publication

EP 1016783 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124452 A

Priority

DE 19860397 A

Abstract (en)

The device incorporates a control chamber (24) with drainage channel having a section (29), which contains an intermediate valve with valve member (57). A connection channel (69) with a first connection profile (70) is provided between valve chamber and control chamber. The intermediate valve member is moved from its closed position towards the control chamber and against a closing force, by the head of the closing valve member (34). This creates a second connection profile between valve chamber (30) and control chamber, which is larger than the first one.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Kraftstoffeinspritzvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen vorgeschlagen, die aus einer Kraftstoffhochdruckquelle (1) Kraftstoffeinspritzventile (9) gesteuert durch eine Steuereinrichtung (8) mit Kraftstoff versorgt. Das Kraftstoffeinspritzventil weist dabei ein Einspritzventilglied (14) auf, dessen Öffnungs- oder Schließstellung durch einen dieses Einspritzventilglied beaufschlagenden in einem Steuerraum (24) eingestellten Druck bestimmt wird. Dazu muß zur Durchführung einer Einspritzung der Druck im Steuerraum (24) entlastet werden, was mit einem Steuerventil (31) erzielt wird, das sequentiell zwei unterschiedliche Abschlußquerschnitte eines Abflußkanals (49) des Steuerraums (24) nacheinander aufsteuert. Damit ist es möglich, eine angepaßte Öffnung des Kraftstoffeinspritzventilglieds für eine Vor- und eine Haupteinspritzung zu bewirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 63/0035 (2013.01); F02M 63/0056 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860397 A1 20000629; EP 1016783 A2 20000705; EP 1016783 A3 20021023; EP 1016783 B1 20040317; JP 2000192870 A 20000711; US 6168096 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-03-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908876 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 47/02 A, 7F 02M 59/46 B, 7F 02M 45/08 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI