Global Patent Index - EP 1016787 A3

EP 1016787 A3 2001-02-21 - Operating method of a compressor having a downstream user, and system operating according to this method

Title (en)

Operating method of a compressor having a downstream user, and system operating according to this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kompressors mit nachgeschaltetem Verbraucher, und nach dem Verfahren arbeitende Anlage

Title (fr)

Procédé d' opération d' un compresseur et système fonctionnant selon ce procédé

Publication

EP 1016787 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121245 A

Priority

DE 19860639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016787A2] A throttle device (9) on the suction side of the compressor (3) is regulated depending on the gas take-up of the user station (7) downstream from the compressor, so that the cross-section of the device is reduced as the gas take-up falls. An Independent claim is also included for the compressor arrangement used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/0284 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016787 A2 20000705; EP 1016787 A3 20010221; EP 1016787 B1 20031210; DE 19860639 A1 20000706; US 6293766 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101025

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101025

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59908016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110325

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20060420

2006-06-28 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20060420

2005-11-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MAN TURBO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2005-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MAN TURBO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2005-04-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAN TURBO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (CHSP)

2005-01-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ATLAS COPCO ENERGAS GMBH

2004-11-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (CHSP)

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-11-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ATLAS COPCO ENERGAS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021010

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI