Global Patent Index - EP 1016791 A2

EP 1016791 A2 2000-07-05 - Arrangement of a fan unit for the heat-exchange assembly of a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Arrangement of a fan unit for the heat-exchange assembly of a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Einrichtung eines Lüfters für die Wärmeaustauscheinheit eines Kraftfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le ventilateur dans l' unité échangeur de chaleur d' un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1016791 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125858 A

Priority

IT TO981098 A

Abstract (en)

A fan unit for the heat-exchange assembly of a motor vehicle, in which the heat-exchange assembly is associated with a front cross-member (9) of the motor-vehicle frame, comprises a structure (19) for supporting at least one bladed rotor (18) for rotation on the front of the heat-exchange assembly, and an air duct (22) for guiding towards the heat-exchange assembly the air drawn along by the rotation of the at least one rotor (18). The structure (19) is mounted releasably on longitudinal sliding guide means (14, 19c) associated with the front cross-member (9) so that the structure (19) can be connected to or separated from the cross-member (9) as a result of a longitudinal sliding movement along the guide means (14, 19c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/58 (2006.01); F04D 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/582 (2013.01); F04D 29/601 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016791 A2 20000705; EP 1016791 A3 20010307; IT 1305094 B1 20010410; IT TO981098 A1 20000630; IT TO981098 D0 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI