Global Patent Index - EP 1016794 A2

EP 1016794 A2 2000-07-05 - Threaded connection

Title (en)

Threaded connection

Title (de)

Stirnschraubung mit Anwendungsbeispielen

Title (fr)

Connection taraudée

Publication

EP 1016794 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98120734 A

Priority

  • DE 19747434 A
  • DE 19829883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829883A1] The furniture elements have nodal point joints, battens and/or surfaces. In the basic position, the nut (3), here with a pivot rod (4), can turn back the turning ring (2) so that the screw (1) is turned back from the nodal point (7). The battens can then be pulled out and so can the surface which is able to be pushed into the grooves by springs (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Stirnschraubung zeigt eine Kopfschraube oder eine Hohlschraube in einer glatten Muffe mit einem Kopf oder Kopfring in der Muffe. Ein Drehring/Führungsring und eine Gewindemutter, welche wahlweise mit Kennzeichnung oder Formanpassung hin zu einer Anschlußgewinde-Muffe wird auf die Schraube angesetzt. Wahlweise ist das Gewinde unterhalb der Gewindemutter abgenommen. Die Erfindung eignet sich für Möbel, Gegenstände, Geräte, Elektroanschlüsse, Rohre und weiteres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 7/04; F16B 21/02; F16B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/00 (2013.01); A47B 47/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829883 A1 20000105; EP 1016794 A2 20000705; EP 1016794 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000727

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16B 7/04 A, 7F 16B 35/00 B, 7F 16B 21/02 B, 7F 16B 7/18 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI