Global Patent Index - EP 1016794 A3

EP 1016794 A3 2000-07-26 - Threaded connection

Title (en)

Threaded connection

Title (de)

Stirnschraubung mit Anwendungsbeispielen

Title (fr)

Connection taraudée

Publication

EP 1016794 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120734 A

Priority

  • DE 19747434 A
  • DE 19829883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829883A1] The furniture elements have nodal point joints, battens and/or surfaces. In the basic position, the nut (3), here with a pivot rod (4), can turn back the turning ring (2) so that the screw (1) is turned back from the nodal point (7). The battens can then be pulled out and so can the surface which is able to be pushed into the grooves by springs (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 7/04; F16B 7/18; F16B 21/02; F16B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/00 (2013.01); A47B 47/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829883 A1 20000105; EP 1016794 A2 20000705; EP 1016794 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000727

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16B 7/04 A, 7F 16B 35/00 B, 7F 16B 21/02 B, 7F 16B 7/18 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI