Global Patent Index - EP 1016820 A2

EP 1016820 A2 2000-07-05 - Medical light

Title (en)

Medical light

Title (de)

Medizinische Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe médicale

Publication

EP 1016820 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125032 A

Priority

DE 19860800 A

Abstract (en)

The carrying element is a single chain (12). Measures or facilities are provided, in order to adjust the illumination body (11) in a desired illumination position, despite the single chain suspension. The chain (12) engages laterally outside the point of gravity and preferably engages at this at the outer edge of the illumination body (11) and consists of links (17), which with vertical alignment of the chain (12) relative to the adjacent links (17), cannot be swiveled away from the illumination body (11).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine medizinische Leuchte für klinische Anwendung mit einem wenigstens eine Lampe enthaltenden, wenigstens eine Lichtaustrittsseite aufweisenden Leuchtenkörper (11), der an wenigstens einem an einer Raumwand, insbesondere der Raumdecke (13) abgestützten, flexiblen, aufwickelbaren Zug-Tragelement (12) höhenverstellbar angebracht ist, das einerseits mit dem Leuchtenkörper (11) und andererseits mit einer an der Raumwand (13) befestigten, einen das Zug-Tragelement (12) ein- bzw. ausfahrenden Antriebsmotor (16) enthaltenden Antriebseinheit (15) verbunden ist und das sich zwischen der Antriebseinheit (15) und dem Leuchtenkörper (11) vertikal erstreckt. Die Erfindung besteht darin, daß das Tragelement eine Einzel-Kette (12) ist, wobei Maßnahmen bzw. Mittel vorgesehen sind, um den Leuchtenkörper (11) trotz der Einzel-Kettenaufhängung in eine gewünschte Beleuchtungsposition einstellen zu können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 19/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/14 (2006.01); F21V 21/36 (2006.01); F21W 131/205 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/36 (2013.01); F21W 2131/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0757204 B1 19981021 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016820 A2 20000705; EP 1016820 A3 20011004; EP 1016820 B1 20030402; DE 19860800 A1 20000706; JP 2000225124 A 20000815; US 6450671 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-02-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-10-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904836

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERCHTOLD HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI