Global Patent Index - EP 1016821 A1

EP 1016821 A1 2000-07-05 - Strip lighting system comprising a support rail to be mounted to a wall or to a ceiling

Title (en)

Strip lighting system comprising a support rail to be mounted to a wall or to a ceiling

Title (de)

Lichtband-System mit einer an einer Wand oder Decke zu befestigenden Tragschiene

Title (fr)

Chemin d' éclairage avec un profil support fixable à un mur ou à un plafond

Publication

EP 1016821 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99126028 A

Priority

  • DE 29823255 U
  • DE 29823256 U

Abstract (en)

The system has a bearing rail fixed at a wall or ceiling with two wire combinations consisting of at least two wires running parallel in same plane. There are electric coupling parts and several elongated lamps The strip light system includes a carrying rail (3) to be fixed at a wall or ceiling, with two wire combinations (31,32) consisting respectively of at least two wires, running parallel and approximately in the same plane (E). Each wire combination is provided with electric coupling parts (13a1,13a2) at distances extending in the longitudinal direction of the wires, which are connected electrically with the wires of the wire combination. The coupling parts of the two combinations are arranged displaced near each other or in the longitudinal direction of the wires. Several elongated lamps are provided, and can be positioned one behind the other in the longitudinal direction on the carrying rail (3), laterally on the rail. Two lamp types can be selected, one lamp part (Ab) of which, only has a counter coupling element. A second lamp part (Aa), has two counter coupling elements (13b1,13b2) lying close together.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Lichtband-System mit folgenden Merkmalen: a) in einer an einer Wand oder Decke zu befestigenden Tragschiene, b) zwei aus jeweils mindestens zwei Drähten bestehende Draht-Kombinationen (31, 33) verlaufen parallel und etwa in der gleichen Ebene, c) jede Draht-Kombination (31, 33) ist in sich in Längsrichtung der Drähte erstreckenden Abständen mit elektrischen Kupplungsteilen (13a1, 13a2) versehen, die mit den Drähten der Draht-Kombination elektrisch verbunden sind. Zwecks Vereinfachung des Lichtband-Systems sind folgende Merkmale vorgesehen: d) die Kupplungsteile (13a1, 13a2) der beiden Draht-Kombinationen (31, 33) sind nebeneinander oder in Längsrichtung der Drähte versetzt angeordnet, e) es sind mehrere längliche Leuchten vorgesehen, die in Längsrichtung auf der Tragschiene (3) hintereinander auf die Tragschiene (3) aufsetzbar sind, f) es stehen mindestens zwei Leuchtentypen zur Auswahl, von denen ein Leuchtentyp nur ein Gegenkupplungselement aufweist, und ein zweiter Leuchtentyp zwei nebeneinander liegende Gegenkupplungselemente aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/00; H01R 25/16; F21V 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); F21V 27/00 (2006.01); H01R 25/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/165 (2013.01); F21S 4/20 (2016.01); F21V 21/025 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21V 27/00 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19615597 A1 19971023 - ELECTRO TERMINAL GMBH [AT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016821 A1 20000705; EP 1016821 B1 20060621; EP 1016821 B2 20140108; AT 237876 T 20030515; AT 245266 T 20030815; AT 331186 T 20060715; AU 2286600 A 20000724; AU 3043800 A 20000724; AU 752657 B2 20020926; CA 2356524 A1 20000713; CA 2356524 C 20080422; CA 2356874 A1 20000713; CA 2356874 C 20091013; DE 59913589 D1 20060803; DK 1141624 T3 20030922; DK 1142070 T3 20030602; EP 1141624 A1 20011010; EP 1141624 B1 20030716; EP 1142070 A1 20011010; EP 1142070 B1 20030416; ES 2196907 T3 20031216; ES 2203244 T3 20040401; NO 20013273 A 20010629; NO 20013273 D0 20010629; NO 20013277 A 20010827; NO 20013277 D0 20010629; NO 319792 B1 20050912; NO 329138 B1 20100830; NZ 511684 A 20030630; PT 1141624 E 20031031; PT 1142070 E 20030829; US 2001045347 A1 20011129; US 2002003702 A1 20020110; US 6491410 B2 20021210; US 6541720 B2 20030401; WO 0040896 A1 20000713; WO 0041277 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 331186 T

- Effective date: 20151227

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913589

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2014-02-13 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59913589

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-01-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2014-01-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2014-01-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59913589

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2013-07-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130701

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061227

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH

- Free text: ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH#SCHWEIZER STRASSE 30#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH#SCHWEIZER STRASSE 30#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ZUMTOBEL STAFF GMBH

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20070321

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-11-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061121

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-10-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913589 P 20060803

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2006-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-07-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 23/00 20060101AFI20051219BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 25/16 20060101ALI20051219BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 23/06 20060101ALI20051219BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 4/00 20060101ALI20051219BHEP

2006-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 21/02 20060101ALI20051219BHEP

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI