Global Patent Index - EP 1016824 A3

EP 1016824 A3 2000-10-11 - Preheater for a pressurised oil atomisation burner

Title (en)

Preheater for a pressurised oil atomisation burner

Title (de)

Vorwärmer für einen Öldruckzerstäubungsbrenner

Title (fr)

Préchauffeur pour un brûleur à pulvérisation de fuel sous pression

Publication

EP 1016824 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125978 A

Priority

DE 19860900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1016824A2] The preheater (10) includes electronic components (40) for controlling the electric heating. The signals of a sensor (38) connected with the heat exchanger (18) are evaluated. A conducting foil (33) is provided, which is connected with the heat exchanger longitudinally and on which the sensor and at least the electric connections of the heating are integrated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016824 A2 20000705; EP 1016824 A3 20001011; EP 1016824 B1 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904837 P 20030508

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUNTEC INDUSTRIES FRANCE SA

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI SE

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI