Global patent index - EP 1016829 A2

EP 1016829 A2 2000-07-05 - Combustion control method for gas boiler

Title (en)

Combustion control method for gas boiler

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbrennungsregelung für einen Gaskessel

Title (fr)

Procédé de régulation de combustion pour une chaudière à gaz

Publication

EP 1016829 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99108670 A

Priority

  • KR 19980059936 A
  • KR 19980059938 A

Abstract (en)

A combustion control method for a gas boiler capable of maintaining a stable combustion state by using a flame voltage by means of an infrared sensor is provided. In the method, it is judged whether a flame voltage is higher than a reference forward wind flame voltage when combustion occurs in the gas boiler. A fan voltage is firstly controlled awhen the flame voltage is higher than the reference forward wind flame voltage and it is judged whether the flame voltage is lower than a reference reverse wind flame voltage when the flame voltage is lower than or equal to the reference forward wind flame voltage. The fan voltage is secondly controlled awhen the flame voltage is lower than the reference reverse wind flame voltage, and the first controlled fan voltage to an original fan voltage according to change amount of the fan voltage by the first control of the fan voltage or the second control of the fan voltage when the flame voltage is equal to or higher than the reference reverse wind flame voltage is compensated. According to the method, when a combustion is imperfect due to external environment such a forward or reverse wind, it can maintain a stable combustion by controlling a fan voltage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/08; F23N 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/082 (2013.01); F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 2033/04 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5332386 A 19940726 - HOSOME KAZUNARI [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016829 A2 20000705; EP 1016829 A3 20030312; CN 1258831 A 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAEWOO GASBOILER CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI