Global Patent Index - EP 1016867 A1

EP 1016867 A1 2000-07-05 - IMMUNOASSAY METHOD FOR BNP

Title (en)

IMMUNOASSAY METHOD FOR BNP

Title (de)

IMMUNOASSAY ZUM BESTIMMEN VON BNP

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE POUR BNP

Publication

EP 1016867 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98941797 A

Priority

  • JP 9804063 W
  • JP 24668497 A

Abstract (en)

An immunoassay specific for mammalian gamma -BNP derivatives, which uses the first antibody reactive with mammalian alpha -BNP and the second antibody reactive with mammalian prepro-BNP or gamma -BNP derivatives and not alpha -BNP, and at least one of the first and the second antibodies is optionally labeled detectably labeled or immobilized. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2013.01); G01N 33/74 (2013.01); G01N 2333/58 (2013.01); Y10S 435/975 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016867 A1 20000705; EP 1016867 A4 20041117; EP 1016867 B1 20060104; AT 315228 T 20060215; AU 731858 B2 20010405; AU 9001098 A 19990329; CA 2304263 A1 19990318; CA 2304263 C 20080729; CN 1161609 C 20040811; CN 1278919 A 20010103; DE 69833118 D1 20060330; DE 69833118 T2 20060831; DK 1016867 T3 20060522; ES 2256952 T3 20060716; JP 3516655 B2 20040405; KR 100563358 B1 20060322; KR 20010023853 A 20010326; NO 20001273 A 20000510; NO 20001273 D0 20000310; NO 325020 B1 20080114; US 2003157596 A1 20030821; US 6828107 B2 20041207; WO 9913331 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180531

2018-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170910

2018-05-09 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-04-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170930

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69833118

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160815

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-08-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20100602

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060910

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2007-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BIO-RAD PASTEUR

2006-11-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BIO-RAD PASTEUR

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256952 T3

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-05-22 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69833118 P 20060330

2006-02-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-02-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-01-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-12-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ASADA, HIDEHISA

2005-12-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIMIZU, HIROYUKI,SANTAUN-OYASHIKI 709

2005-12-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENDO, KAZUAKI

2004-11-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 A

2004-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/68 B

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE