Global patent index - EP 1016919 A2

EP 1016919 A2 2000-07-05 - Photographic element having encoded data on reverse side

Title (en)

Photographic element having encoded data on reverse side

Title (de)

Photographisches Element mit kodierten Daten auf der Rückseite

Title (fr)

Elément photographique ayant des données codées sur la face arrière

Publication

EP 1016919 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204484 A

Priority

US 22447898 A

Abstract (en)

This invention comprises a photographic print comprising a photographic support having a photographic image on one side thereof and encoded data on the side of the support opposite the image, wherein the material comprising the encoded data is invisible under normal viewing conditions and capable of being read by a sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 11/02; G03C 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/765 (2006.01); G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 11/02 (2013.01); G03C 1/7614 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/7614 + G03C 2001/7628

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016919 A2 20000705; EP 1016919 A3 20020109; JP 2000221637 A 20000811

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050104

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI