Global patent index - EP 1016996 A2

EP 1016996 A2 2000-07-05 - Bill processing server and a digital document delivery system

Title (en)

Bill processing server and a digital document delivery system

Title (de)

Server zum Verarbeiten von Rechnungen und System zum Ausliefern von digitalen Dokumenten

Title (fr)

Serveur pour le traitement de factures et système de délivrance de documents numériques

Publication

EP 1016996 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99126155 A

Priority

US 22221998 A

Abstract (en)

A bill processing server and method forms part of an overall digital document delivery system and is primarily responsible for maintaining an account database which in turn contains information concerning the account balance of the customers which receive electronic bills. The bill processing server interacts with a router instruction processor for receipt of bill data objects for updating the account database as well as for receiving customer response information via an interactive bill presentment server so as to maintain the account database including receipt of payment information from the customers. The bill processing server can send account information to an associated payment processing system. The bill processing server can also generate reports concerning the status of the account database and can further generate notification to the customer of an existence of an electronic bill. Finally the bill processing server can generate links to secondary documents to be associated with a generated primary document (bill). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1016996 A2 20000705; EP 1016996 A3 20010214; CA 2293203 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status

2012-12-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20120727

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 A

2003-11-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BILL PROCESSING SERVER AND A DIGITAL DOCUMENT DELIVERY SYSTEM

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI