Global patent index - EP 1017024 A3

EP 1017024 A3 2000-12-13 - Method for processing variable service data structures and display texts in a processing module and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for processing variable service data structures and display texts in a processing module and apparatus for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verarbeiten veränderbarer Dienstdatenstrukturen und Displaytexten in einem Verarbeitungsmodul und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour traiter des structures de données de service et des textes d'affichage variables dans une module de traitement et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1017024 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250401 A

Priority

DE 19857778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857778A1] The method involves providing new service data in memory storage area of a service data memory (3) in the processing module for a base unit for future processing based on the service data. The service data memory contains at least a first memory area (30) for a source table and a second area for display texts and table data for calculations. A microprocessor is used to access the second memory area via the source table stored in the first area, pointers being used to indicate the addresses of the stored display text data and table data. An apparatus for performing the method is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0037 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00419 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857778 A1 20000608; EP 1017024 A2 20000705; EP 1017024 A3 20001213; US 6594648 B1 20030715

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20110406

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI