Global Patent Index - EP 1017025 A2

EP 1017025 A2 2000-07-05 - Receipt-free electronic voting method and system

Title (en)

Receipt-free electronic voting method and system

Title (de)

Gesichertes elektronisches Abstimmverfahren ohne Empfangsbestätigung und dazugehöriges System

Title (fr)

Système et procédé de vote électronique sécurisé sans accusé de réception

Publication

EP 1017025 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99250450 A

Priority

JP 37176898 A

Abstract (en)

A method of effectively providing, with minimum physical limitation, a secure receipt-free protocol which does not supply a receipt which proves contents of voting action to a voter. A vote generating center and a converting center generate voting data and send them to each vote selecting device. Then, each vote selecting device selects its own vote based on the voting data. When a counting center counts the vote, the voting data are converted to a new configuration of data or existing voting data and the correctness of the configuration or the conversion is proved. Further, correspondence of the configuration or the conversion is sent only to the vote selecting device via an anti-eavesdropping channel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 9/32 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/10 (2012.01); G06Q 50/26 (2012.01); G06Q 50/34 (2012.01); G07C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017025 A2 20000705; EP 1017025 A3 20000726; JP 2000194782 A 20000714; JP 3233119 B2 20011126

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100119

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI