Global Patent Index - EP 1017063 A1

EP 1017063 A1 2000-07-05 - Structural reinforced energy and/or telecom cable

Title (en)

Structural reinforced energy and/or telecom cable

Title (fr)

Câble de transport d'energie et/ou de télécommunications structurellement reforcé

Publication

EP 1017063 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402737 A

Priority

FR 9816710 A

Abstract (en)

The cable assembly comprises an outer sheath structure that is formed from a number of twisted outer (6) and inner wires (5). The wires are wound around an inner isolation sheath (4) within which are arranged the transmission wire bundles (2). A central stiffening wire (1) is located within the wire bundles.

Abstract (fr)

Câble de transport d'énergie ou de télécommunications structurellement renforcé par incorporation d'au moins un fil de renfort (1) ou d'une armure comportant une ou plusieurs couches de fils (5 et/ou 6). Le câble comporte au moins un fil de renfort ou d'armure et/ou éventuellement un tube constitué en un acier composite ayant un coeur en acier, d'un type standard, recouvert d'une couche d'acier inoxydable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 003 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 045 (E - 0880) 26 January 1990 (1990-01-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017063 A1 20000705; EP 1017063 B1 20050105; DE 69923053 D1 20050210; DE 69923053 T2 20051208; FR 2788162 A1 20000707; FR 2788162 B1 20010330; US 2002027012 A1 20020307; US 6747213 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111104

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923053

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111104

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923053 P 20050210

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BONICEL, JEAN-PIERRE

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI