Global Patent Index - EP 1017077 A1

EP 1017077 A1 2000-07-05 - Switch assembly

Title (en)

Switch assembly

Title (de)

Schalteranordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble commutateur

Publication

EP 1017077 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99125564 A

Priority

JP 37379798 A

Abstract (en)

To reduce number of components to be used and make the whole structure axially down-sized in a switch assembly which includes a push operation member and a rotary operation member,A first push operation member 21 and a second push operation member 22 are mounted together on a light guiding member 9 thereby to eliminate necessity of such an exclusive holder in assembling the push operation members 21, 22 as required in a conventional switch assembly. An angle adjusting piece for giving an angular adjustment to rotary operation of a rotary operation member 36 is integrally formed at an inner periphery of the rotary operation member 36, avoiding necessity of a separate component. Further, the angle adjusting piece and angle adjusting notches 19 are so arranged as to face with each other in a diametrical direction of the rotary operation member 36. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 25/06; B60K 37/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/52 (2006.01); H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 9/18 (2006.01); H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01); H01H 89/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/065 (2013.01); H01H 9/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0605324 A1 19940706 - VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017077 A1 20000705; EP 1017077 B1 20030521; DE 69908076 D1 20030626; DE 69908076 T2 20031120; JP 2000195362 A 20000714

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051221

2004-12-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908076 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI