Global patent index - EP 1017083 A1

EP 1017083 A1 2000-07-05 - Plasma display having a porous structure

Title (en)

Plasma display having a porous structure

Title (de)

Plasma-Anzeigetafel bestehend aus einer porösen Struktur

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage à plasma ayant une structure poreuse

Publication

EP 1017083 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403033 A

Priority

  • FR 9816093 A
  • FR 9816094 A
  • FR 9908629 A

Abstract (en)

The plasma display panel consists of two facing plates (2,4) enclosing a discharge space comprising an array of discharge cells. The panel includes a layer of a material which contains less 10 % of a hardening agent, the layer being either a barrier layer or, more generally, a layer of a gettering material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49; H01J 7/18; H01J 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 9/39 (2006.01); H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/52 (2012.01); H01J 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 9/241 (2013.01); H01J 9/242 (2013.01); H01J 9/39 (2013.01); H01J 11/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] FR 2738393 A1 19970307 - KYOCERA CORP [JP]
  • [DA] US 4037130 A 19770719 - MIMITSUKA TAKAO, et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 10 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 005 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6483238 B1 20021119; EP 1017083 A1 20000705; JP 2000215817 A 20000804

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20060515

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030714

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-09-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PLASMA DISPLAY PANEL HAVING A POROUS STRUCTURE

2000-08-30 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C3

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI