Global Patent Index - EP 1017118 A2

EP 1017118 A2 2000-07-05 - Organic electroluminescent element and production method thereof

Title (en)

Organic electroluminescent element and production method thereof

Title (de)

Organische elektrolumineszente Vorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif organique électroluminescent et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1017118 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310577 A

Priority

JP 37386598 A

Abstract (en)

An organic electroluminescent element comprising at least a light emitting layer containing an organic light emitting material placed between an anode and a cathode, wherein the element has, between the anode and the light emitting layer, at least a hole transporting layer containing a hole transporting material and an acceptor, and an electron injection restraining layer restraining the injection of electrons from the light emitting layer into the hole transporting layer, from the anode side, and/or, between the light emitting layer and the cathode, at least an electron transporting layer containing an electron transporting material and a donor, and a hole injection restraining layer restraining the injection of holes from the light emitting layer into the electron transporting layer, from the cathode side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 51/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 33/02 (2010.01); H01L 51/50 (2006.01); H05B 33/10 (2006.01); H05B 33/12 (2006.01); H05B 33/14 (2006.01); H05B 33/22 (2006.01); H01L 51/00 (2006.01); H01L 51/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/5012 (2013.01); H01L 51/5052 (2013.01); H01L 51/5096 (2013.01); H01L 51/0051 (2013.01); H01L 51/0059 (2013.01); H01L 51/0078 (2013.01); H01L 51/0081 (2013.01); Y10S 428/917 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • EP 0498979 A1 19920819 - TOSHIBA KK [JP]
  • J. BLOCHWITZ ET AL.: "Low voltage organic light emitting diodes featuring doped phthalocyanine as whole transport material", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 73, no. 6, 1998, pages 729
  • A. YAMAMORI ET AL.: "Doped Organic Light Emitting Diodes having a 650nm thick hole transport layer", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 72, no. 17, 1998, pages 2147

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017118 A2 20000705; EP 1017118 A3 20020724; JP 2000196140 A 20000714; US 6566807 B1 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01L0051200000

- IPC: H01L0051500000

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-05-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01L0051200000

- IPC: H01L0051500000

2013-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130629

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090921

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI