Global Patent Index - EP 1017255 A1

EP 1017255 A1 2000-07-05 - Sensor setting for cooktop

Title (en)

Sensor setting for cooktop

Title (de)

Anbauanordnung eines Sensors bei einem Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Montage d'un capteur dans une table de cuisson

Publication

EP 1017255 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403324 A

Priority

FR 9816657 A

Abstract (en)

The cooking table comprises a hearth plate (1), an inductive cooking furnace (2) located under the hearth plate and a temperature sensor (5) supported by the upper surface (7) of the plate. A cooking utensil is heated an the temperature attained measured by the sensor.. The sensor remains in a fixed position on the hearth plate assembly.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte au montage d'un capteur dans une table de cuisson. La table de cuisson comporte une plaque d'âtre (1), un foyer de cuisson (2) situé sous la plaque d'âtre (1), la plaque d'âtre (1) étant destinée à supporter un ustensile de cuisine chauffé par le foyer de cuisson (2), un capteur (6) fixé à la plaque d'âtre (1), une liaison (13) entre le capteur (6) et des moyens de traitement (12). Conformément à l'invention, la liaison (13) est disposée entre le foyer de cuisson (2) et la plaque d'âtre (1), et elle s'étend au-delà du foyer de cuisson (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/062 (2013.01); H05B 2213/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017255 A1 20000705; EP 1017255 B1 20030312; DE 69905850 D1 20030417; FR 2788114 A1 20000707; FR 2788114 B1 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20160420

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20110826

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905850

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2002-06-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COOKTOP WITH SENSOR

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COOKTOP WITH SENSOR

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI