Global Patent Index - EP 1017256 A1

EP 1017256 A1 2000-07-05 - Temperature sensor setting for cooktop

Title (en)

Temperature sensor setting for cooktop

Title (de)

Anbauanordnung eines Temperatursensors bei einem Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Montage d'un capteur de température dans une table de cuisson

Publication

EP 1017256 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403325 A

Priority

FR 9816658 A

Abstract (en)

The cooking table comprises a hearth plate (1), an inductive cooking furnace (2) located under the hearth plate and a temperature sensor (5) supported by the upper surface (7) of the plate. A cooking utensil is heated an the temperature attained measured by the sensor.. The sensor remains in a fixed position on the hearth plate assembly.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte au montage d'un capteur de température dans une table de cuisson. La table de cuisson comporte une plaque d'âtre (1), un foyer de cuisson (2) à induction située sous la plaque d'âtre, un capteur de température (5), la plaque d'âtre (1) étant destinée à supporter sur sa face supérieure (7) un ustensile de cuisine chauffé par le foyer de cuisson (2), le capteur de température (5) comprenant une zone sensible (6) mesurant la température en une zone située au-dessus de la plaque d'âtre (1) à la verticale du foyer de cuisson (2). Selon l'invention, la zone sensible (6) du capteur de température (5) est maintenue en position fixe sur la face supérieure (7) de la plaque d'âtre (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/062 (2013.01); H05B 2213/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017256 A1 20000705; EP 1017256 B1 20030312; DE 69905851 D1 20030417; FR 2788115 A1 20000707; FR 2788115 B1 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2007-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-06-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905851 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2002-05-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COOKTOP WITH TEMPERATURE SENSOR

2002-04-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COOKTOP WITH TEMPERATURE SENSOR

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI