Global Patent Index - EP 1017270 A1

EP 1017270 A1 2000-07-12 - PLANT LIKE STARCHES AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THEM IN HOSTS

Title (en)

PLANT LIKE STARCHES AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THEM IN HOSTS

Title (de)

PFLANZLICHE STÄRKE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG IN WIRTE

Title (fr)

AMIDONS VEGETAUX ET METHODES PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE LESDITS AMIDONS DANS DES HOTES

Publication

EP 1017270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914483 A

Priority

  • US 9806660 W
  • US 4293997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9844780A1] This invention relates to hosts containing constructs with genes from the starch pathway. More typically the present invention relates to bacterial hosts that form plant like starches. Additionally the present invention relates to plant hosts that have genes from the starch pathway. The invention further relates to the starches produced by said hosts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01H 5/00; C12N 15/29; C12N 15/31; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74; C12N 15/80; C12N 15/81; C12N 15/82; C12P 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C08B 30/00 (2006.01); C08B 37/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12N 15/70 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12N 15/80 (2006.01); C12N 15/81 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12P 19/04 (2006.01); C12P 19/16 (2006.01); C12P 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1051 (2013.01); C12N 9/107 (2013.01); C12N 9/1241 (2013.01); C12N 15/8245 (2013.01); C12P 19/04 (2013.01); C12P 19/16 (2013.01); C12P 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9844780 A1 19981015; AU 6882898 A 19981030; CA 2283719 A1 19981015; EP 1017270 A1 20000712; EP 1017270 A4 20060524; JP 2001519664 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-05-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/29 20060101AFI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/31 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/54 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/70 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/74 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/80 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/81 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/82 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 19/04 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2006-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01H 5/00 20060101ALI20060401BHEP

2005-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE