Global Patent Index - EP 1017273 B1

EP 1017273 B1 2002-11-13 - PLASTICS HORSESHOE

Title (en)

PLASTICS HORSESHOE

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFHUFEISEN

Title (fr)

FER A CHEVAL EN PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1017273 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942914 A

Priority

  • GB 9802778 W
  • GB 9720462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915006A1] A stock from which circumferential lengths can be cut to be used as horseshoes, the stock comprising a helical coil of plastics material wound about an axis such that the cross section of the coil in a plane containing the axis is constant in shape for any such plane and substantially correpsonds to the cross section of a horseshoe in the same plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01L 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01L 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01L 5/00 (2013.01); Y10S 168/01 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2925 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915006 A1 19990401; AT 227507 T 20021115; AU 729037 B2 20010125; AU 729037 C 20011206; AU 9087998 A 19990412; BR 9812830 A 20000808; CA 2303150 A1 19990401; CA 2303150 C 20070814; DE 69809454 D1 20021219; DE 69809454 T2 20030508; DK 1017273 T3 20030310; EP 1017273 A1 20000712; EP 1017273 B1 20021113; ES 2188004 T3 20030616; GB 9720462 D0 19971126; NZ 503135 A 20010831; US 6349773 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170930

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160909

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188004 T3

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809454 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227507 T 20021115

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI