Global Patent Index - EP 1017291 A1

EP 1017291 A1 2000-07-12 - ENERGY EXPENDITURE/TRAINING GARMENT

Title (en)

ENERGY EXPENDITURE/TRAINING GARMENT

Title (de)

SPORTBEKLEIDUNG MIT ENERGIEAUFWAND

Title (fr)

VETEMENT DE DEPENSE D'ENERGIE ET D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 1017291 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939346 A

Priority

  • US 9816668 W
  • US 92225697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5867826A] An energy expenditure/training garment includes a suit having integral resistance panels and a base fabric covering other portions of the suit. The suit includes a body portion, arm portions and leg portions. In one practice of the invention the resistance panels and the base fabric are made of contrasting colors to provide indicating structure of the type of garment. In other practices of the invention various connecting structure is used to connect the resistance panels of the leg directly to footwear such as sneakers, roller blades or boots so that the footwear functions as anchor structure for the panels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A63B 21/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/055 (2013.01); A41D 13/0015 (2013.01); A63B 21/0004 (2013.01); A63B 21/00069 (2013.01); A63B 21/00185 (2013.01); A63B 21/0552 (2013.01); A63B 21/4009 (2015.10); A63B 21/4013 (2015.10); A63B 21/4017 (2015.10); A63B 21/4019 (2015.10); A63B 21/4021 (2015.10); A63B 21/4025 (2015.10); A63B 21/4043 (2015.10); A41D 2300/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5867826 A 19990209; AU 8779698 A 19990316; BR 9815590 A 20010116; EP 1017291 A1 20000712; EP 1017291 A4 20010502; JP 2001513581 A 20010904; WO 9909846 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040709

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-05-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 41D 13/00 A, 7A 63B 21/055 B, 7A 41D 13/02 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB