Global Patent Index - EP 1017295 A1

EP 1017295 A1 2000-07-12 - SOFTSIDE LUGGAGE CASE HAVING A SINGLE PERIPHERAL FRAME AND TWO SIDE-BY-SIDE COMPARTMENTS

Title (en)

SOFTSIDE LUGGAGE CASE HAVING A SINGLE PERIPHERAL FRAME AND TWO SIDE-BY-SIDE COMPARTMENTS

Title (de)

WEICHSCHALIGER KOFFER MIT EINEM EINZIGEN PERIPHERIERAHMEN UND ZWEI NEBENEINANDERANGEORDNETEN FÄCHERN

Title (fr)

VALISE A FLANCS SOUPLES MUNI D'UN SEUL CADRE PERIPHERIQUE ET DE DEUX COMPARTIMENTS COTE A COTE

Publication

EP 1017295 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99935939 A

Priority

  • US 9916929 W
  • US 9443198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005990A1] A luggage case having a large pocket (40) carried by the main packing door (30). The pocket is formed by portions of the rail (20) releasably attached to the main case by a sinuous path zipper track (32), and a gusset (44) along the lower, self hinged portion (34) of the door. The resulting compartment protrudes into the interior of the case, and over at least one of the wheels (26), thus providing good organization within the case while helping to keep the case balanced on the wheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 5/00; A45C 3/00; A45C 13/00; A45C 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 5/00 (2006.01); A45C 3/00 (2006.01); A45C 5/06 (2006.01); A45C 5/14 (2006.01); A45C 13/00 (2006.01); A45C 13/02 (2006.01); A45C 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/103 (2013.01); A45C 3/001 (2013.01); A45C 5/14 (2013.01); A45C 13/02 (2013.01); A45C 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005990 A1 20000210; CA 2304298 A1 20000210; CN 1163175 C 20040825; CN 1274263 A 20001122; EP 1017295 A1 20000712; EP 1017295 A4 20020828; JP 2002521108 A 20020716; KR 100461531 B1 20041214

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-05-05 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMSONITE IP HOLDINGS S.A.R.L

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071121

2002-08-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE