Global Patent Index - EP 1017305 A1

EP 1017305 A1 2000-07-12 - MOPS AND MOP COMPONENTS

Title (en)

MOPS AND MOP COMPONENTS

Title (de)

WISCHGERÄT UND WISCHGERÄTBESTANDTEILE

Title (fr)

BALAIS A LAVER ET LEURS COMPOSANTS

Publication

EP 1017305 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903475 A

Priority

  • US 9800637 W
  • US 5708897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909876A1] Disclosed is a butterfly mop having an elongate shaft (21) with a channel body (50) disposed at one end of the shaft, the channel body having first and second leg portions (51, 52) defining a channel therebetween, the mop further having a mop element (26) including a foldable, compressible, liquid-absorbent member. The mop element and channel body are hingedly movable along a hinge line (62) relative to one another, whereby the mop element may be drawn into the channel causing the mop element to fold along a transverse axis and to become compressed between the channel body leg portions. A manual actuation mechanism includes a handle (66) and a tension rod (68) connecting the handle to one of the mop element and channel body for effecting relative hinged movement thereof. The mop element preferably includes plural pairs of apertures (135-138) for allowing mounting of the mop element to variously sized mop element supports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/144; A47L 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/146 (2006.01); A47L 13/258 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/146 (2013.01); A47L 13/258 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909876 A1 19990304; AT 353588 T 20070315; AU 6023998 A 19990316; CA 2302039 A1 19990304; CA 2302039 C 20040921; DE 69837099 D1 20070329; DE 69837099 T2 20070712; EP 1017305 A1 20000712; EP 1017305 A4 20001122; EP 1017305 B1 20070214

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120115

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 353588 T

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69837099

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FREUDENBERG HOUSEHOLD PRODUCTS LP

- Effective date: 20120131

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070716

2007-05-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070514

2007-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837099 P 20070329

2007-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 13/144 A, 7A 47L 13/12 B, 7A 47L 13/146 B, 7A 47L 13/258 B, 7A 47L 13/46 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL PT SE