Global Patent Index - EP 1017311 A1

EP 1017311 A1 2000-07-12 - OPTICAL EXTRAVASATION DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

OPTICAL EXTRAVASATION DETECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN ANZEIGE VON GEFÄSSAUSTRITTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION OPTIQUE D'UN EPANCHEMENT

Publication

EP 1017311 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949360 A

Priority

  • US 9819378 W
  • US 5974997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915074A1] The present invention is an extravasation detection apparatus that optically detects extravasation of an injection fluid into an area of tissue during infusion. The apparatus includes an electronics control module (10), and a disposable conduit (1). The disposable conduit includes a sensor pad (100) having a lower surface for placement against a patient, and a cable (200) extending from the sensor pad to the electronics control module. At least one light source (14) is provided on either the sensor pad or the electronics control module. The light source emits light below the lower surface of the sensor pad. At least one light detector (15) is provided on either the sensor pad or the electronics control module. The detector detects the light from the light source that is reflected, scattered, diffused or otherwise emitted from the patient. The electronics control module processes signals from the detector, and evaluates whether extravasation has occurred.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00; A61M 5/168

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/27 (2006.01); A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 10/00 (2006.01); A61M 5/168 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/16836 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915074 A1 19990401; AU 9569898 A 19990412; CA 2301209 A1 19990401; EP 1017311 A1 20000712; EP 1017311 A4 20040721; JP 2001517469 A 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-07-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/00 A

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61M 5/168 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE