Global patent index - EP 1017320 A1

EP 1017320 A1 2000-07-12 - APPARATUS FOR THE COLLECTION OF INTERSTITIAL FLUIDS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR THE COLLECTION OF INTERSTITIAL FLUIDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERSTITIELLEN FLÜSSIGKEITSENTNAHME

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR LA COLLECTE DE FLUIDES INTERSTITIELS

Publication

EP 1017320 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953739 A

Priority

  • US 9822114 W
  • US 6543197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920181A1] The present invention involves apparatus and methods for use in collecting bodily fluids, such as interstitial fluids, from the epidermal layer of an animal. A preferred apparatus includes a pressure head and, optionally, a holder therefor for supplying a positive pressure to the head. The methods include the application of a positive pressure to the area surrounding an epidermal site from which stratum corneum has been breached, such as by laser ablation, to cause bodily fluids, such as interstitial fluids, to exude from the site and collecting the fluids exuding therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/02 (2006.01); A61B 5/15 (2006.01); A61B 10/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/132 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/14514 (2013.01); A61B 5/150022 (2013.01); A61B 5/150068 (2013.01); A61B 5/150343 (2013.01); A61B 5/15134 (2013.01); A61B 10/0045 (2013.01); A61B 17/1322 (2013.01); A61B 2010/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920181 A1 19990429; CA 2306728 A1 19990429; EP 1017320 A1 20000712; JP 2002527120 A 20020827; JP 4338307 B2 20091007

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051213

2005-08-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS FOR THE COLLECTION OF INTERSTITIAL FLUIDS

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABBOTT LABORATORIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040223

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL