Global Patent Index - EP 1017366 A1

EP 1017366 A1 2000-07-12 - SOLID COPRECIPITATES FOR ENHANCED BIOAVAILABILITY OF LIPOPHILIC SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

SOLID COPRECIPITATES FOR ENHANCED BIOAVAILABILITY OF LIPOPHILIC SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

FESTE KOPRÄZIPITATE ZUR VERBESSERTEN BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT LIPOPHILER SUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

COPRECIPITES SOLIDES AUGMENTANT LA BIODISPONIBILITE DE SUBSTANCES LIPOPHILES

Publication

EP 1017366 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940639 A

Priority

  • IL 11917696 A
  • US 9715072 W
  • US 83307697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808490A1] Lipophilic active ingredient are co-melted with tocopherol polyethyleneglycol succinate ("TPGS") and a dispersion adjuvant to obtain solid dry coprecipitate compositions suitable as an oral dosage form. The solid TPGS coprecipitates of lipophilic active ingredients show improved drug release in vitro and enhanced oral bioavailability in vivo.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/14; A61K 9/16; A61K 9/19; A61K 9/20; A61K 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/19 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/352 (2006.01); A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/4045 (2006.01); A61K 31/7008 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/14 (2006.01); A61K 47/22 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/145 (2013.01); A61K 9/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808490 A1 19980305; AU 4237397 A 19980319; AU 730216 B2 20010301; CA 2264718 A1 19980305; CA 2264718 C 20060530; EP 1017366 A1 20000712; EP 1017366 A4 20060322; JP 2001523221 A 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081014

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060818

2006-03-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060203

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMOS CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990331

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE