Global patent index - EP 1017387 A1

EP 1017387 A1 2000-07-12 - VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST

Title (en)

VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST

Title (de)

VITRONEKTIN REZEPTOR ANTAGONIST

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTE DU RECEPTEUR DE VITRONECTINE

Publication

EP 1017387 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949454 A

Priority

  • US 9819949 W
  • US 5983297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915170A1] A compound of formula (I) is disclosed which is a vitronectin receptor antagonist and is useful in the treatment of osteoporosis or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/52; A61K 31/55; A61P 3/14; C07D 401/12; C07D 401/14; C07D 403/12; C07D 413/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 33/24 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2013.01); A61K 31/55 (2013.01); A61K 33/24 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 33/24 + A61K 31/55
  2. A61K 31/55 + A61K 31/47
  3. A61K 31/55 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 33/24 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915170 A1 19990401; AU 9577498 A 19990412; BR 9813208 A 20000822; CA 2303846 A1 19990401; CN 1273529 A 20001115; EP 1017387 A1 20000712; EP 1017387 A4 20040818; HU 0003949 A2 20011028; IL 135189 D0 20010520; JP 2002528380 A 20020903; NO 20001514 A 20000323; NO 20001514 D0 20000323; PL 339413 A1 20001218; TR 200000792 T2 20000921

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030743

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041002

2004-08-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/44 A

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/47 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/52 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/55 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/415 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 401/12 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 401/14 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 403/12 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07D 413/12 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 3/14 B

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HEERDING, DIRK, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PHARMACEUTICALS

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000328