Global Patent Index - EP 1017422 A1

EP 1017422 A1 2000-07-12 - CLONING USING DONOR NUCLEI FROM NON-SERUM STARVED, DIFFERENTIATED CELLS

Title (en)

CLONING USING DONOR NUCLEI FROM NON-SERUM STARVED, DIFFERENTIATED CELLS

Title (de)

Klonierung unter Verwendung von Spender-Kernen aus Serum-entzogenen, differenzierten Zellen

Title (fr)

CLONAGE A L'AIDE DE NOYAUX DONNEURS A PARTIR DE CELLULES DIFFERENTIEES NE PRESENTANT PAS DE CARENCE SERIQUE

Publication

EP 1017422 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931400 A

Priority

  • US 9812800 W
  • US 88828397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901163A1] An improved method of nuclear transfer involving the transplantation of donor differentiated cell nuclei from non-serum starved cells into enucleated oocytes of the same species as the donor cell is provided. The resultant nuclear transfer units are useful for multiplication of genotypes and transgenic genotypes by the production of fetuses and offspring, and for production of isogenic CICM cells, including human isogenic embryonic or stem cells. Production of genetically engineered or transgenic mammalian embryos, fetuses and offspring is facilitated by the present method since the differentiated cell source of the donor nuclei can be genetically modified and clonally propagated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A01K 67/02 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/877 (2010.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8771 (2013.01); A61K 49/0008 (2013.01); A61K 35/12 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2517/02 (2013.01); C12N 2517/04 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • WO 9707668 A1 19970306 - ROSLIN INST EDINBURGH [GB], et al
  • US 5945577 A 19990831 - STICE STEVEN L [US], et al
  • CIBELLI J.B. ET AL.: "Cloned transgenic calves produced from nonquiescent fetal fibroblasts", SCIENCE, vol. 280, 22 May 1998 (1998-05-22), pages 1256 - 1258, XP000786003
  • MACKENZIE D., COHEN P.: "Vive le Clone ! A French calf answers some of the questions about cloning", NEW SCIENTIST, 21 March 1998 (1998-03-21), pages 1 PG, XP002970999
  • ZAWADA W.M. ET AL.: "Somatic cell cloned transgenic bovine neurons for transplantation in Parkinsonian rats", NATURE MEDICINE, vol. 4, no. 5, May 1998 (1998-05-01), pages 569 - 574, XP002938435
  • See also references of WO 9901163A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901163 A1 19990114; AU 8154398 A 19990125; BR 9811657 A 20000905; CA 2294916 A1 19990114; CN 101003800 A 20070725; CN 1265599 A 20000906; EP 1017422 A1 20000712; EP 1017422 A4 20021029; IL 133786 D0 20010430; JP 2001509361 A 20010724; NZ 502129 A 20050225

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070929

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE,STEVEN, L.

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES, M.

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLUEKE, PAUL

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONCE DE LEON, F., ABEL

2006-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERRY, D., JOSEPH

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE,STEVEN, L.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES, M.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLUEKE, PAUL

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONCE DE LEON, F., ABEL

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERRY, D., JOSEPH

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-12-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/00 A, 7A 01K 67/027 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12N 5/06 B

2002-10-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE,STEVEN, L., ASSOC.PROF. ANIMAL SCIE.RESEARCH

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES, M.

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLUEKE, PAUL

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONCE DE LEON, F., ABEL

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERRY, D., JOSEPH

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STICE, STEVEN, L.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIBELLI, JOSE

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBL, JAMES, M.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLUEKE, PAUL

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONCE DE LEON, F., ABEL

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERRY, D., JOSEPH

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE