Global Patent Index - EP 1017424 A1

EP 1017424 A1 2000-07-12 - LIPOPHILIC METAL COMPLEXES FOR NECROSIS AND INFARCT IMAGING

Title (en)

LIPOPHILIC METAL COMPLEXES FOR NECROSIS AND INFARCT IMAGING

Title (de)

LIPOPHILE METALL-KOMPLEXE FÜR NEKROSE UND INFARKT-IMAGING

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES METALLIQUES LIPOPHILES POUR NECROSES ET IMAGERIE DE L'INFARCTUS

Publication

EP 1017424 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945248 A

Priority

  • DE 19744004 A
  • EP 9805185 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916474A1] The present invention describes the use of metal complexes with at least 10 % plasma protein binding as imaging diagnostic agents for locating an infarct or necrosis by persistent, positive representation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/00; A61K 51/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/06 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916474A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916474 A1 19990408; AU 9262898 A 19990423; CA 2304461 A1 19990408; CA 2304461 C 20081014; DE 19744004 C1 19990722; EP 1017424 A1 20000712; JP 2001518454 A 20011016; NO 20001520 A 20000525; NO 20001520 D0 20000323; NO 321235 B1 20060410

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091009

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080903

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE