Global patent index - EP 1017513 A1

EP 1017513 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING SHEET-LIKE OBJECTS FORM CONTAINERS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING SHEET-LIKE OBJECTS FORM CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ENTLADEN VON BLATTFÖRMIGEM GUT AUS BEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DECHARGER DE CONTENANTS DES OBJETS SOUS FORME DE FEUILLES

Publication

EP 1017513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947350 A

Priority

  • DE 9802122 W
  • DE 19742367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742367A1] According to the invention, the containers (B) with flatly piled letters (G) are placed automatically in a V-shaped receiving device (A) by initially placing the containers in a holding device (HV). A plunger (S) then holds down the letters (G), whereupon the holding device (HV) is positioned on the receiving device (A) so that the closed opening of the container (B) faces the bottom of the receiving device (A). The plunger (S) is finally raised and swung laterally so that the letters (G) can slide into the receiving device (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2006.01); B07C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422542 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915284A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742367 A1 19990401; EP 1017513 A1 20000712; EP 1017513 B1 20020320; JP 2001517590 A 20011009; US 6336782 B1 20020108; WO 9915284 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040727

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030710

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020916

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-03-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR UNLOADING SHEET-LIKE OBJECTS FROM CONTAINERS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS DEMATIC AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL