Global Patent Index - EP 1017518 A1

EP 1017518 A1 2000-07-12 - FLOWTURNING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTERNAL GEARED WHEELS WITH TWO SETS OF INNER TOOTHING

Title (en)

FLOWTURNING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTERNAL GEARED WHEELS WITH TWO SETS OF INNER TOOTHING

Title (de)

DRÜCKWALZVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLRÄDERN MIT ZWEI INNENVERZAHNUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FLUOTOURNAGE ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION D'ENGRENAGES A DEUX DENTURES INTERIEURES

Publication

EP 1017518 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925614 A

Priority

  • DE 19722359 A
  • EP 9802922 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722359A1] The invention relates to a flowturning device (1; 101) for producing an internal geared wheel (17) with inner toothing, one set of which is slanted. The workpiece (9) is held by a retaining member (16; 116) during shaping of the first inner toothing. The workpiece (9) is held by the first toothing on the first shaping tool (2; 102) during shaping of the second inner toothing. Once the internal geared wheel (17) has been finished, the rotational coupling between both shaping tools (2, 4; 102, 104) is detached. The internal geared wheel (17) is detached from the slanted toothing(s) by means of a stripping member (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21H 5/02; B21J 5/12; B21K 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/16 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21H 7/18 (2006.01); B21J 5/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/30 (2006.01); B21H 1/04 (2006.01); B21H 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 7/187 (2013.01); B21D 22/16 (2013.01); B21H 5/025 (2013.01); B21H 1/04 (2013.01); B21H 3/08 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853934A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722359 A1 19981203; AT 214987 T 20020415; EP 1017518 A1 20000712; EP 1017518 B1 20020327; JP 2002500564 A 20020108; US 6253589 B1 20010703; WO 9853934 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-09-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803553 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-03-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214987 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYNAFORM GMBH

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE