Global Patent Index - EP 1017527 A1

EP 1017527 A1 2000-07-12 - CONTINUOUS EXTRUSION PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR RODS MADE OF A PLASTIC RAW MATERIAL AND PROVIDED WITH A SPIRAL INNER CHANNEL

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS EXTRUSION PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR RODS MADE OF A PLASTIC RAW MATERIAL AND PROVIDED WITH A SPIRAL INNER CHANNEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN EXTRUSION VON MIT EINEM WENDELFÖRMIGEN INNENKANAL AUSGESTATTETEN STÄBEN AUS PLASTISCHEM ROHMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXTRUSION EN CONTINU D'UNE BARRE EN UNE MATIERE PREMIERE PLASTIQUE POURVUE D'UN CANAL INTERIEUR EN SPIRALE

Publication

EP 1017527 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97950028 A

Priority

  • DE 19644447 A
  • EP 9705910 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644447A1] A continuous extrusion process and device are disclosed for rods made of a plastic raw material and provided with at least one inner channel which at least in part is spiral-shaped. The raw material may be a powder-metallurgical or ceramic mass. The plastic raw material is extruded through a nozzle mouthpiece and made to rotate by means of an arrangement of flow guiding surfaces provided therein, entraining at least one thread made of a flexible or elastic material and giving it a spiral shape with a predetermined pitch. The thread is retained upstream of the nozzle mouthpiece in an eccentric position relative to the rod axis and extends through the nozzle mouthpiece. In order to improve production accuracy and production tolerances of the extruded rod blank while simplifying the corresponding device, the movement of rotation of the plastic raw material is adjusted by an outer adjusting force which modifies the angle between the arrangement of flow guiding surfaces and the longitudinal axis of the nozzle mouthpiece in order to adjust the position and/or the pitch of the at least one inner spiral channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 51/06 (2006.01); B21C 23/14 (2006.01); B21C 25/08 (2006.01); B22F 3/20 (2006.01); B22F 5/10 (2006.01); B28B 3/20 (2006.01); B28B 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 5/10 (2013.01); B21C 23/147 (2013.01); B21C 25/08 (2013.01); B22F 3/20 (2013.01); B28B 3/26 (2013.01); B22F 2005/001 (2013.01); B22F 2005/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9818587A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644447 A1 19980430; DE 19644447 C2 20011018; AT 214317 T 20020315; EP 1017527 A1 20000712; EP 1017527 B1 20020313; HK 1027774 A1 20020823; JP 2002514138 A 20020514; JP 3935961 B2 20070627; US 6248277 B1 20010619; WO 9818587 A2 19980507; WO 9818587 A3 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706644 20020418

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI LU SE

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214317 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990419

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI LU SE