Global Patent Index - EP 1017545 A1

EP 1017545 A1 2000-07-12 - HAND-HELD MACHINE-TOOL HAVING A FRONT AND A REAR PARTS WHICH ARE OFFSET RELATIVE TO THE HOUSING FOR TWO-HAND USE

Title (en)

HAND-HELD MACHINE-TOOL HAVING A FRONT AND A REAR PARTS WHICH ARE OFFSET RELATIVE TO THE HOUSING FOR TWO-HAND USE

Title (de)

HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE MIT EINER VORDEREN UND EINER HINTEREN ABKNICKUNG DES GEHÄUSES FÜR ZWEIHANDBEDIENUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL TENUE AVEC LES MAINS PRESENTANT UNE PARTIE DESAXEE AVANT ET UNE PARTIE DESAXEE ARRIERE DU BOITIER POUR PERMETTRE UNE UTILISATION A DEUX MAINS

Publication

EP 1017545 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931910 A

Priority

  • DE 9801046 W
  • DE 29717071 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915316A1] The present invention relates to a hand-held machine-tool (10) comprising an oblong housing (12) and a rotating tool (20), such as a brush insert, which is arranged at a given angle relative to the main part (12a) of the housing. The machine-tool is particularly easy and safe to handle since the tool (20) is mounted on the housing (12) at an angle not exceeding 90 DEG , and preferably not exceeding 60 DEG , relative to the housing main part (12a). A region of the housing (12) for receiving the tool (20) is parallel to or in alignment with the tool (20) and inclined relative to the housing main part (12a) so as to define an offset front part (28). The ease of use and safety are also ensured by the fact that a rear end region of the housing (12) opposite from the tool (20) is equally bent downward at an angle not exceeding 90 DEG , and preferably not exceeding 60 DEG , relative to the housing main part (12a) so as to define an offset rear part (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02; A46B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/02 (2006.01); B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/02 (2013.01); B24B 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915316A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717071 U1 19990204; BR 9812670 A 20000822; CN 1145546 C 20040414; CN 1271307 A 20001025; DE 59813832 D1 20070111; EP 1017545 A1 20000712; EP 1017545 B1 20061129; JP 2001517560 A 20011009; WO 9915316 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813832

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080411

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070609

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-04-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070312

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813832 P 20070111

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL