Global patent index - EP 1017546 A1

EP 1017546 A1 2000-07-12 - ELECTRIC DRY RAZOR

Title (en)

ELECTRIC DRY RAZOR

Title (de)

TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

RASOIR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1017546 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936164 A

Priority

  • AT 9900180 W
  • AT 50598 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006348A1] The invention relates to an electric dry razor (1) which comprises at least one shear blade (5) arranged in a pivoting head frame which is closed at the sides. Blades oscillating in the longitudinal direction of the shear blades (5) cooperate with said shear blade. The head is removably joined to the base (2) containing the drive unit. The head frame (3) is configured in two parts. The outer head part (4) which supports the shear blade(s) (5) is joined to the part (6) of the head frame (3) that is removably fixed to the base (2) about an approximately central swivelling axis (8) which is perpendicular to the direction of oscillation (7) of the blades.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006348A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006348 A1 20000210; AT 2988 U1 19990825; CN 1089660 C 20020828; CN 1274311 A 20001122; DE 59904838 D1 20030508; EP 1017546 A1 20000712; EP 1017546 B1 20030402; JP 2002521164 A 20020716; US 6301786 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120927 AND 20121003

2012-10-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GEORG VOLMER, DE

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1017546E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904838

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE