Global patent index - EP 1017548 A1

EP 1017548 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE HEATING OF GLUED JOINT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE HEATING OF GLUED JOINT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHEIZUNG VON KLEBVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CHAUFFER DES ASSEMBLAGES PAR COLLAGE

Publication

EP 1017548 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 96906126 A

Priority

  • SE 9600236 W
  • SE 9500801 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627482A1] The present invention relates to a method and to apparatus for accelerating the curing of glue joints (4) as the glue joints move, and particularly to the curing of glue joints between two elongated objects which are to be glued together end-to-end, wherein the glue joints are cured in a high-frequency (HF) electric field generated between two electrode surfaces (5, 3) disposed on respective opposite surfaces of the mutually joined objetcs and connected to a high-frequency generator. The inventive method comprises causing a high-frequency field which is limited essentially to the glue joint to accompany the glue joint through a specific distance sufficient to achieve curing of the glue in the glue joint. The apparatus is characterized in that the first electrode surface (3) is stationary and elongated and has a length sufficient to achieve curing of a glue joint that moves along the electrode surface. The other electrode surface (5) is arranged for movement in the movement direction of the glue joint (4) and has a surface which at least covers the glue joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2006.01); B27M 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/10 (2013.01); B27M 3/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9627482A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627482 A1 19960912; AU 4959996 A 19960923; DE 69624518 D1 20021128; DE 69624518 T2 20030618; DK 1017548 T3 20030224; EP 1017548 A1 20000712; EP 1017548 B1 20021023; FI 974146 A0 19971105; FI 974146 A 19971105; SE 9500801 D0 19950306

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69624518

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020205

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971006

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE