Global patent index - EP 1017554 A1

EP 1017554 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CONCRETE STONES, ESPECIALLY PAVING STONES, BUILDING STONES OR SUCH LIKE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING CONCRETE STONES, ESPECIALLY PAVING STONES, BUILDING STONES OR SUCH LIKE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BETONSTEINEN, INSBESONDERE PFLASTERSTEINEN, MAUERSTEINEN OD.DGL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE BLOCS EN BETON, NOTAMMENT DE PAVES, PIERRES A BATIR OU SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 1017554 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99925008 A

Priority

  • DE 19827104 A
  • EP 9903427 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827104A1] The invention relates to a method for producing concrete stones, especially paving stones, building stones or such like, comprising a base part made of coarse-grained concrete (6) and a coloured facing layer made of concrete mortar which solidly covers the top of the base part. The coarse-grained concrete (6) is filled into a shaping tool (3) and compacted by vibrating and/or pressing in the shaping tool (3). From a storage reservoir (5) coloured concrete mortar is deposited on the coarse-grained concrete in the sunk chamber of the shaping tool (3) and compacted. The invention aims to make it possible to obtain concrete mortar mixtures for preparing facing layers having a similar defined aspect. To this end the concrete mortar constituting the facing layer is formed of differently coloured layers (8, 9, 10, 11) which are stored in a stacked manner at the top of the reservoir (5). The concrete layers (8, 9, 10, 11) jointly and simultaneously are freely moved downwards by gravity together with partial sections and collide with or are guided onto an impact element (12) which is configured at a variable distance from the wall of the storage reservoir (5) and projects into the travel path of the partial sections. The partial sections are further guided by the impact element (12) along at least one deflection path and then mixed. As multicoloured concrete mortar they form, on the coarse-grained concrete, a marbled facing layer to be compacted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/08 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/0215 (2013.01); B28B 13/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965655A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827104 A1 19991223; DE 19827104 C2 20011206; AT 250491 T 20031015; CA 2301703 A1 19991223; CA 2301703 C 20090317; DK 1017554 T3 20040119; EP 1017554 A1 20000712; EP 1017554 B1 20030924; ES 2209443 T3 20040616; JP 2002518199 A 20020625; JP 4421110 B2 20100224; US 6461552 B1 20021008; WO 9965655 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071204

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070519

2008-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEIGER PETER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209443

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030405264

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-01-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-01-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907112

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-06-19 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20020325

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL SE