Global Patent Index - EP 1017565 A1

EP 1017565 A1 2000-07-12 - VENDING MACHINE FOR MAKING AND SUPPLYING BOOKS

Title (en)

VENDING MACHINE FOR MAKING AND SUPPLYING BOOKS

Title (de)

VERKAUFSAUTOMAT ZUM HERSTELLEN UND ABGEBEN VON BÜCHERN

Title (fr)

MACHINE POUR LA FABRICATION ET LA DISTRIBUTION DE LIVRES

Publication

EP 1017565 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931433 A

Priority

  • IL 9900390 W
  • IL 12538998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003876A1] A vending machine (1) for making books which includes a computer data storage device (31) for storing a plurality of book titles, each including the text and image information, the cover information which may be in color, title and other identification of a plurality of books, an operating panel (2) including a display for displaying the identification information of the books stored in the storage device and the user's interface enabling a user to select one of the stored book titles for printing, and a book making apparatus for printing and binding the selected book.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 1/00 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B42C 19/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/16 (2006.01); G07F 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/16 (2013.01); G07F 17/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003876 A1 20000127; AU 4796299 A 20000207; CA 2304247 A1 20000127; CN 1274315 A 20001122; DE 1017565 T1 20010125; DE 69909226 D1 20030807; DE 69909226 T2 20040429; EP 1017565 A1 20000712; EP 1017565 A4 20010816; EP 1017565 B1 20030702; IL 125389 A 20020725; IL 125389 D0 19990312; JP 2002520726 A 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080714

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080714

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *HELWLETT-PACKARD INDUSTRIAL PRINTING LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2007-03-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: APRION DIGITAL LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909226

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-08-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41F 13/64 A, 7B 42C 19/00 B, 7G 07F 17/26 B, 7G 07F 17/16 B

2001-01-25 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-09-15 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB