Global Patent Index - EP 1017590 A2

EP 1017590 A2 2000-07-12 - PORTABLE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING AND PROVIDING CONSUMABLE SUBSTANCES TO PETS

Title (en)

PORTABLE CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING AND PROVIDING CONSUMABLE SUBSTANCES TO PETS

Title (de)

TRAGBARER BEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN UND BEREITSTELLEN VON VERBRAUCHSSUBSTANZEN FÜR HAUSTIERE

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT PORTATIF PERMETTANT LE TRANSPORT DE PRODUITS CONSOMPTIBLES AINSI QUE LEUR DISTRIBUTION A DES ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1017590 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97936494 A

Priority

US 9714241 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9908938A2] A portable container for transporting and providing consumable substances, preferably liquid, to pets includes a storage container for storing a substance and a removably attached serving container. The storage container includes a carrying strap to facilitate transport of the portable container and indicia, preferably a photograph, identifying the pet or pet owner. The indicia is covered by a lens to protect and maintain the indicia on the storage container. The storage container further includes a spout to facilitate transference of the substance to and from the storage container, and a spout cover to prevent spillage during transport. Tabs are disposed on the serving and storage containers wherein the tabs are positioned adjacent each other when the serving container is placed on the storage container to facilitate attachment and removal of the serving container from the storage container. The serving container is removed from the storage container to receive the substance from the storage container and to enable a pet to consume that substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9908938 A2 19990225; WO 9908938 A3 19990514; AU 3915097 A 19990308; CA 2301050 A1 19990225; EP 1017590 A2 20000712; EP 1017590 A4 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-08-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PORTABLE CONTAINER FOR TRANSPORTING AND PROVIDING CONSUMABLE SUBSTANCES TO PETS

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2000-10-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 1/00 A, 7A 01K 7/00 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE