Global Patent Index - EP 1017593 A1

EP 1017593 A1 2000-07-12 - RESEALABLE POUCH FOR TOBACCO

Title (en)

RESEALABLE POUCH FOR TOBACCO

Title (de)

WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE TASCHE FÜR TABAK

Title (fr)

BLAGUE A TABAC POUVANT ETRE REFERMEE HERMETIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 1017593 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924490 A

Priority

  • GB 9801589 W
  • GB 9711248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854060A1] A pouch (1) for tobacco comprises a pocket (5) for containing the tobacco and has a mouth (7) providing access to the interior of the pocket (5). It also has a flap (6) capable of folding over the pocket (5) at or near the mouth. The mouth (7) of the pocket (5) is provided, at one edge thereof, with a closure strip (9) adapted to interengage with a complementary closure strip (10) provided at the other edge for reclosing the mouth (7) of the pocket (5) to form a seal. The pouch keeps tobacco contained in the sealed pocket fresh by preserving the aroma and moisture content of the tobacco over a prolonged period up to and after the time of first use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/25; A24F 23/02; A44B 19/00; B65D 81/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24F 23/02 (2006.01); A44B 19/00 (2006.01); B65D 33/25 (2006.01); B65D 81/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/22 (2013.01); A24F 23/02 (2013.01); A44B 19/00 (2013.01); B65D 33/2508 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854060A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854060 A1 19981203; AT 212937 T 20020215; AU 7668398 A 19981230; DE 69803787 D1 20020321; DE 69803787 T2 20020822; DK 1017593 T3 20020325; EP 1017593 A1 20000712; EP 1017593 B1 20020206; ES 2168761 T3 20020616; GB 9711248 D0 19970723; PT 1017593 E 20020731

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168761 T3

2002-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400436

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-03-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803787 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212937 T 20020215

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPERIAL TOBACCO LIMITED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE